skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 5:42:20 AM

Brown, Gregory Michael

CPSO#: 17833

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health 100 Stokes Street Toronto, ON M6J 1H4
Date Received: 09 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2014