skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 6:07:25 PM

Best, Christopher Norrys

CPSO#: 17362

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 1960 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1959
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005