skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 4:45:48 AM

Gencher, Moses

CPSO#: 16154

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Date of Death: 23-Dec-2006

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1957
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005