skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 4:57:14 AM

Bondy, Donald Clarence

CPSO#: 15744

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1961 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2008