skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 10:54:45 AM

Hanley, William Bawden

CPSO#: 14831

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 595 Broadway Ave Toronto ON M4G 2S4
Date Received: 10 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2019