skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/04/2019 9:02:51 PM

Wyatt, John Kenneth

CPSO#: 14800

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Jun 2001

Summary

Date of Death: 6-Dec-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Dec 1959 RCPSC Specialist
Urology Effective: 28 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001