skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:48:59 AM

Henderson, Marion Main

CPSO#: 14329

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2005