skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 4:02:24 AM

Buckley, George Finlay

CPSO#: 13924

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1988