skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 5:54:33 PM

Laing, Lorne Pennington

CPSO#: 13432

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996