skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:27:02 PM

Whitman, Rodger Austin

CPSO#: 12725

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Jan-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1948
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Oct 1992