skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:14:55 AM

Parrott, Fraser Cartwright

CPSO#: 11515

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jan 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 22-Dec-2010

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1994