skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:07:32 PM

Dyson, Charles Wilbert

CPSO#: 11391

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 1995
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Jun-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1949 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1943
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1995