skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 2:23:55 AM

Fox, Mitchell Adam

CPSO#: 105386

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 12
585 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4K4
Phone: (613) 842-0444
Fax: (613) 518-6546 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

2675 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: 613-258-6133 Ext. 400
Fax: 613-258-4997
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mitchell Fox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fox ( CPSO# 105386)

Business Address:
12-585 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4K4
Phone Number: (613) 842-0444


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MITCHELL ADAM FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015