skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 3:48:11 AM

Matino, Davide

CPSO#: 105317

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 17 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Perugia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematology & Thromb.
Department of Medicine
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 365 888 6160 Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVIDE MATINO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MATINO is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. MATINO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MATINO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. MATINO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. MATINO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. MATINO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Sep 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 13 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Apr 2016
Clinical Fellow - Laboratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2019