skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:27:43 PM

Murphy, Arthur Birmingham

CPSO#: 10516

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 14-May-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1937

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1937
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993