skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 9:57:03 PM

Mutrie, Eric Tolton

CPSO#: 10456

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Sep 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 21-Dec-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1937

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1937
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 1993