skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 11:35:09 PM

Batey, Cristina Ashley

CPSO#: 101090

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 23 May 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2016 to 21 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 21 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Apr 2019