skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 10:44:59 PM

Ransom, Allison

CPSO#: 100798

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Ransom, Allison-Mella (used until: 17 Apr 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Holland Court
PO Box 1209
Bradford ON  L3Z 2B6
Phone: (905) 775-8782
Fax: (905) 775-9290 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ransom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ransom ( CPSO# 100798)

Business Address:
100 Holland Court
Bradford ON  L3Z 1R8
Phone Number: (705) 812-4903

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON RANSOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANSOM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015