skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:16:07 AM

Nichols, Kathleen Denise

CPSO#: 100630

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
743 Lansdowne St W.
Peterborough ON  K9J 1Z2
Phone: (705) 775-1783
Fax: 705-201-1287 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K.D. Nichols Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nichols ( CPSO# 100630)

Business Address:
743 Lansdowne Street West
Peterborough ON  K9J 1Z2
Phone Number: (705) 775-1783

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN DENISE NICHOLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015