skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 11:50:37 PM

Dorosh, Kyle Alexander

CPSO#: 100441

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room 260
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kyle Dorosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dorosh ( CPSO# 100441)
Dr. R. Gow ( CPSO# 106469)

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
Room 260
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL-3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLE ALEXANDER DOROSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOROSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016