skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 5:17:23 AM

Bejaei, Fatemeh

CPSO#: 100391

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Feb 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, French, Persian, Turkish

Education:Tabriz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Urgent Care Clinic
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: (905) 876-3843 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Fatemeh Bejaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bejaei ( CPSO# 100391)

Business Address:
Milton Urgent Care Clinic
103-400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 876-3843

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FATEMEH BEJAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEJAEI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2016