skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 3:30:15 AM

Filemban, Ameerah Ahmad Mohammed

CPSO#: 100142

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jun 2013 to 02 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2014