skip to content

von Aesch, Zoe Frances

CPSO#: 97945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Costa-von Aesch, Zoe Frances (used until: 01 Jan 2019 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sumac Creek Health Centre, SMH
73 Regent Park Blvd.
3rd floor
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: (416) 864-3022
Fax: (416) 864-6051 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZOE FRANCES VON AESCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VON AESCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2014