skip to content

van Veenendaal, Mira

CPSO#: 97279

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of Utrecht, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2012 to 25 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015