van Diepen, Kristen Elizabath (CPSO#: 100995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Long Lake Medical Group
2120 Regent Street Unit 9
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 523-9199
Fax: (705) 523-9197
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristen van Diepen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. van Diepen ( CPSO# 100995)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
9-2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 523-9199

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN ELIZABATH VAN DIEPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DIEPEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015