skip to content

kinaia, ban Micheal

CPSO#: 94298

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elite Care Clinics
Unit 110
250 Tecumseh rd.East
Windsor ON  N8X 2R3
Phone: (519) 971-2901 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kinaia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jan 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2013 Active
 Dr.  Ban  Micheal  Kinaia  may  practise medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.