skip to content

de Souza, Fructuoso Martinho Jose Antonio

CPSO#: 23875

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F.M. de Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited Head Office Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Jun 2014


Address: Records Management Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904 E-mail: [email protected]
Date Received: 23 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2015