skip to content

de Sousa Castro, Marina

CPSO#: 94078

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Apr 2028
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Escola de Medicina e Saude Publica, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil
Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:29 Apr 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Nov 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 28 Apr 2028

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2021 Active
 1. Dr. MARINA DE SOUSA CASTRO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DE SOUSA CASTRO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DE SOUSA CASTRO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DE SOUSA CASTRO's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DE SOUSA CASTRO's certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 29 April, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 28 April, 2028.