skip to content

de Silva, Lande Bandarage Pujitha Prasad

CPSO#: 88610

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1476 Aldersbrook Road
London ON  N6G 0P5
Phone: (519) 474-7300
Fax: (519) 474-7309 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: De Silva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. de Silva ( CPSO# 88610 )

Business Address:
1476 Aldersbrook Road
London ON  N6G 0P5
Phone Number: (519) 474-7300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LANDE BANDARAGE PUJITHA PRASAD DE SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SILVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010