de SA, Darren Lucien (CPSO#: 98654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital 5M
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X5
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32267
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren L. de SA Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. de SA ( CPSO# 98654 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN LUCIEN DE SA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE SA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Aug 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017