skip to content

de Montbrun, Sandra Lynn

CPSO#: 87856

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 314
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 4H8
Phone: 905-901-1533
Fax: 905-901-1534 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1240 White Lane
Sandra de Montbrun Medicine Profess
Oakville ON  L6M 2T6
Canada
Phone: 6473085262
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sandra de Montbrun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. de Montbrun ( CPSO# 87856 )

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: 9059011533

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Colorectal Surgery
Cardinal Carter Wing Room 16 064
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5005

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDRA LYNN DE MONTBRUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MONTBRUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2007 to 04 Jan 2008
EL - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009