skip to content

de Jong, Jennifer Dorien

CPSO#: 97009

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: de Jong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking to obtain their record can contact: 6 Speers Blvd., Unit J, Amherstview, ON., K7N 1Z6, Tel: 613-634-4354
Date Received: 25 Oct 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER DORIEN DE JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011