skip to content

de Gussem, Els Maria

CPSO#: 87192

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Erasmus University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 13 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2007