skip to content

da Rosa Borges, Bruno Cesar

CPSO#: 87932

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75166 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: da Rosa Borges Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. da Rosa Borges ( CPSO# 87932 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2018 Active
 Dr. Bruno Cesar da Rosa Borges may practise medicine independently in
            anaesthesiology.