skip to content

Wing King, bertram

CPSO#: 22803

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 245-3555
Fax: (416) 222-9604 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bertram Wing King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. b. Wing King ( CPSO# 22803 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 747-3824

Business Address:
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 245-3555

 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

For records created after 2016, patients should forward their requests to: Unit A4-2 Champagne Drive Toronto ON  M3J 2C5. For records created prior to 2016, patients should contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services at 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 07 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BERTRAM WING KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WING KING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Oct 2015
Summary:

On October 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Wing King committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Wing King did not contest the allegation.

Patient A first attended Dr. Wing King’s medical practice in 2012 and returned for a total of five medical appointments between 2012 and 2013. She attended on Dr. Wing King in the fall of 2013 for treatment of a facial rash. Dr. Wing King prescribed a cream for treatment of the rash.

Patient A returned for her scheduled follow up appointment one week later. During that appointment, Dr. Wing King noted that the patient’s facial rash was resolving and he provided reassurance in this regard. Patient A was concerned about the possibility of permanent scarring on her face. At the conclusion of the appointment, Dr. Wing King kissed the patient on the forehead and commented, “You look pretty now.” His conduct was at all times intended to be supportive of Patient A. Patient A reported that the kiss was “fatherly” but that it was inappropriate in the context of a medical appointment. Patient A did not return to see Dr. Wing King.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Wing King’s certificate of registration, to be removed forthwith once Dr. Wing King provides proof of completion of the course to the College:
a. Dr. Wing King shall successfully complete the next available course in Understanding Boundaries, at his own expense.
- Dr. Wing King appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Wing King pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of the Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 14, 2015