skip to content

alipio, al Delos Santos

CPSO#: 93680

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone: (905) 388-5996
Fax: (905) 388-5721 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Alipio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. a. alipio ( CPSO# 93680 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone Number: (905) 388-5996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AL DELOS SANTOS ALIPIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIPIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012