skip to content

Zymantas, Jennifer Ann Carla

CPSO#: 95505

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1813 Lasalle Blvd
Back Medical Offices
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Phone: 705-222-2933
Fax: 705-222-2238 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury District Nurse Practitioner
623 Main Street
Lively ON  P3Y 1M9
Canada
Phone: (705) 692-1667
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1813 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON  P3A 2A3
Canada
Phone: (705) 222-2933
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Sudbury District Nurse Practitioner
30 Ste. Anne Road
3rd floor
Sudbury ON  P3E 5E1
Canada
Phone: (705) 671-1661
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

30 Ste. Anne Rd
Sudbury ON  P3C 5E1
Canada
Phone: 705-671-1661
Fax: 705-671-0177
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. A. Zymantas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zymantas ( CPSO# 95505 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7147

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN CARLA ZYMANTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZYMANTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013