skip to content

Zwingerman, Rhonda Gina

CPSO#: 97137

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 - 260 Town Centre Blvd
Markham ON  L3R 8H8 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility Effective:30 Dec 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RHONDA GINA ZWINGERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZWINGERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2012 to 09 Nov 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 08 Nov 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014