skip to content

Margaliot, Zvi

CPSO#: 68746

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Sep 2016
EXPIRY DATE
19 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zvi Margaliot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 8 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Sep 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 17 May 2022
Summary:

On May 17, 2022, the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal granted Dr. Margaliot's application for reinstatement.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 30, 2022

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Sep 2016
Summary:

On September 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Zvi Margaliot committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional, including by:
a) Making remarks of a sexual nature not appropriate to the care provided; and
b) Engaging in a sexual relationship which included sexual intercourse during the physician-patient relationship.

Dr. Margaliot, who has held a certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario since 2005, is certified by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada as a specialist in plastic surgery, and practices medicine as a hand surgeon.

Patient A was referred to Dr. Margaliot for recurring wrist pain and was first treated by him in March 2009. At the time, Patient A was twenty-two years old and an undergraduate student.

Between March 2009 and June 2010, Dr. Margaliot treated Patient A on ten occasions, including performing two surgeries on her right wrist.

In April 2010, while still engaged in a doctor-patient relationship, Patient A sent Dr. Margaliot a friend request via Facebook, which Dr. Margaliot accepted.

In June 2010, at the last post-operative appointment following her second wrist surgery, Dr. Margaliot stated in his clinical record that he would be happy to see Patient A back if she had any concerns.

In August 2010, Patient A contacted Dr. Margaliot through Facebook. Shortly thereafter, the two began to correspond by email.

In October 2010, Patient A invited Dr. Margaliot for coffee. Dr. Margaliot proposed a meeting place, and the two met for coffee. The two continued to exchange emails of a sexual nature.

On a date in December 2010, Patient A emailed Dr. Margaliot as follows:
“Zvi, my wrist is killing me.. its bad enough I can barely use a speculum because its so weak...
a) Is this anything physio might fix (friend’s suggestion)
b) is it still appropriate for you to be my physician and
c) is there anything else we can do for this because it hurrrrts”

Dr. Margaliot replied:
“R or L wrist
PT is usually not indicated until you a) have a diagnosis and b) it is something amenable to PT. I can look at it for you next week. Call Zohra ..."

Dr. Margaliot then asked "why, are you over-using your wrist?" and she replied "you’d like that wouldn’t you.”
Dr. Margaliot treated Patient A in his office practice on a date in January 2011. On a date later on in January 2011, the two met for coffee. After this meeting, the two began texting. Some of the texts were of a sexual nature.

In February 2011, the two met for coffee and kissed. They met two days later in his office, in the evening, and engaged in kissing and touching of a sexual nature. In early March 2011, following a sexually explicit Gchat communication, the two met in the on-call room of the Hospital and had intercourse.

Dr. Margaliot treated Patient A again on a date in March 2011. He examined her for 50 minutes. At that appointment, she signed a consent for a third surgery, this time on her left wrist.

Subsequently, in close proximity to the appointment, while still engaged in a physician- patient relationship, the two had sexual intercourse, including in his office.

Her surgery did not proceed. The two continued to have a secret sexual affair, on again and off again, in 2011 and 2012.

PENALTY

On September 19, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Margaliot’s certificate of registration be revoked, effective immediately.

On September 22, 2016, the Discipline Committee further ordered and directed that:

-Dr. Margaliot appear before the panel to be reprimanded;
- Dr. Margaliot reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment of such amounts within thirty (30) days of the date this Order becomes final, in the amount of $16,060.00; and
-Dr. Margaliot pay costs to the College in the amount of $15,000.00 within thirty (30)days of the date this Order becomes final.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): September 19 and 22, 2016