skip to content

Zurawska-Fortin, Urszula

CPSO#: 88380

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Zurawska, Urszula (used until: 10 Dec 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
6 East Oncology Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6235
Fax: (416) 530-6656 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fortin and Zurawska-Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Zurawska-Fortin ( CPSO# 88380 )
Dr. C. Fortin ( CPSO# 90497 )

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
Room G-178
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B9
Phone Number: (416) 530-6235

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Suite 304
2 Lansing Square
North York ON  M2J 4P8
Phone Number: (416) 489-0711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. URSZULA ZURAWSKA-FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZURAWSKA-FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012