skip to content

Zur, Daniel

CPSO#: 31089

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Daniel Zur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 4 100 Highland Road West Kitchener, ON N2M 3B5
Instructions: Medical Records with Dr. Kevin Mayer
Date Received: 15 May 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1909
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1979