Zulys, Matthew (CPSO#: 98501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept. of General Surgery
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 289-776-7193
Fax: 905-945-8853
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Zulys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ZULYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZULYS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017