skip to content

Zuijdwijk, Caroline Sarah

CPSO#: 86000

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Endocrinology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3939
Fax: (613) 738-4236 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Zuijdwijk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zuijdwijk ( CPSO# 86000 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Endocrinology and Metabolism
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLINE SARAH ZUIJDWIJK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUIJDWIJK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2007 to 06 Apr 2007
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2007 to 04 May 2007
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2008 to 14 Nov 2008
EL - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011