skip to content

Zoueva, Svetlana

CPSO#: 99491

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kemerovo State Medical Academy, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Rouge Valley Health System Centenary Site 2867 Ellesmere Road Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Date Received: 29 May 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017