skip to content

Rona, Zoltan Peter

CPSO#: 30224

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 19
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone: (905) 764-8700
Fax: (905) 764-6641 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Jun 2022

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Zoltan Peter Rona’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Tribunal of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Rona is incompetent and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of a patient; that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in his complementary/alternative medicine practice, including but not limited to his billing practices; and that between approximately March 2020 and September 2021, he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or is incompetent in relation to his communications, including but not limited to communications on social media regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues, including but not limited to making misleading, false or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19 and discriminatory statements about groups and individuals.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Merits: 2022.11.04

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 02 Jun 2022 Active
 As from June 2, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Zoltan Peter Rona, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. ZOLTAN PETER RONA
("Dr. Rona")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;	

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public. 

(2)	I, Dr. Rona, certificate of registration number 30224, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline Tribunal, in the matter of College File Number CAS-392754-Y9N9Y8, allegations that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to my care and treatment of a patient and that I am incompetent.

(4)	I, Dr. Rona, have read the Notice of Hearing dated April 11, 2022, which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the allegations against me.

(5)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

(6)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the Code.

(7)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the Discipline Tribunal.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(8)	I, Dr. Rona, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(9)	Clinical Supervision 

(a)	I, Dr. Rona, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), ("Clinical Supervision").

(b)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks;

(ii)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor in consultation with the College and independent of my participation, on the basis of the areas of concern identified in the medical assessor's report, dated November 1, 2021, and any concerns that arise during the period of Clinical Supervision;

(iii)	Directly observe my provision of care to patients for at least one (1) full day of patient encounters every two weeks and review my patient charts in respect of the encounters observed, in addition to the patient charts reviewed under section 9(b)(ii). Such observation may take place in person or remotely, at the sole discretion of the Clinical Supervisor;

(iv)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and observations;

(v)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(vi)	Submit written reports to the College at least once every month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated November 1, 2021, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Rona, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Rona, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Rona, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (9)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (9)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(10)	I, Dr. Rona, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(11)	I, Dr. Rona, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(13)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(14)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(15)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(16)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(17)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that in the event of an appeal of any Order of the Discipline Tribunal, if the Discipline Tribunal has directed the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately despite any appeal.

(18)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(19)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Rona is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of a patient and that he incompetent. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Rona must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 

D.	CONSENT

(20)	I, Dr. Rona, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(21)	I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 

(22)	I, Dr. Rona, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(23)	I, Dr. Rona, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(24)	I, Dr. Rona, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A"; 

(c)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking. 


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 2, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr Zoltan Peter Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 2, 2022:   

 

Dr. Rona is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of a patient and that he incompetent. As a result of the referral:



Dr. Rona must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 21, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)