skip to content

Znajda, James Paul

CPSO#: 18755

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1963

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education: Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.P. Znajda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

203-1585 Markham Road
Scarborough, Ontario  M1B 2W1
Date Received: 31 May 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2022