skip to content

Zlatescu, Magdalena Cecilia

CPSO#: 91932

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015