skip to content

Zizzo, Richard Allan

CPSO#: 31518

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
325 Winterberry Drive
Hamilton ON  L8J 0B6
Phone: (905) 575-9004
Fax: (905) 575-9026 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Richard A. Zizzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zizzo ( CPSO# 31518 )

Business Address:
Unit 206
325 Winterberry Drive
Hamilton ON  L8J 0B6
Phone Number: (905) 575-9004


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD ALLAN ZIZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIZZO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1980