skip to content

Zizzo, Angelo Joseph

CPSO#: 20733

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 02 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 2-Apr-2020

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Angelo Zizzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zizzo ( CPSO# 20733 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
325 Winterberry Drive
Hamilton ON  L8J 0B6
Phone Number: (905) 388-1254

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Suite 201 - 325 Winterberry Drive, Hamilton, ON, L8J 0B6.
Date Received: 16 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1967
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 02 Apr 2020