skip to content

Zikman, Jerrold Malcolm

CPSO#: 23530

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jerrold Zikman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 414 Victoria Avenue Hamilton ON L8L 5G8
Instructions: c/o Dr. M. Greenspan
Date Received: 25 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017